THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 3:53:47 AM
Engmann, Abena Adwokua
CPSO#:
93155
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Dec 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Otchere Engmann, Abena Adwokua (used until: 31 Oct 2013 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Halton Healthcare Services
Georgetown Hospital
1 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown ON L7G 2B8
Phone: (905) 873-0111
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Grey Bruce Health Services,Wiarton Site |
Wiarton |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital |
Georgetown |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:20 Dec 2013 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ABENA ADWOKUA ENGMANN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ENGMANN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 20 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2019 to 15 Dec 2019
CF - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Dec 2013 |