skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 31/07/21 2:24:03 AM

Bajaj, Ravi Roshan

CPSO#: 93137

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:University Of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
5 Fairview Mall Drive Suite 260
North York ON  M2J 2Z1
Phone: (416) 907-4990
Fax: (416) 907-1465 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Ravi R. Bajaj Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 20 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Bajaj ( CPSO# 93137 )

Business Address:
Milton Cardiac Care
Suite 109
311 Commercial Street
Milton ON  L9T 3Z9
Phone Number: (905) 878-9805

Business Address:
306 - 1333 Sheppard Avenue East
North York ON  M2J 1V1
Phone Number: (416) 553-3916

Business Address:
4001 Lesile Street
North York ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective:16 Nov 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RAVI ROSHAN BAJAJ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAJAJ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014