skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 25/07/21 15:02:09 PM

Levenstadt, Jeremy Stephen

CPSO#: 93078

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Minto Place
Main Atrium
407 Laurier Ave W
Unit 4
Ottawa ON  K1R 7Y7
Phone: (613) 702-5371
Fax: (613) 702-0490 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

407 Laurier Ave West
Unit 4
Ottawa ON  K1R 7Y7
Canada
Phone: 6137025371
Fax: 3438882147
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Levenstadt Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 04 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Levenstadt ( CPSO# 93078 )

Business Address:
4 - 407 Laurier Avenue West
Ottawa ON  K1R 7Y7
Phone Number: (613) 702-5371

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JEREMY STEPHEN LEVENSTADT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEVENSTADT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2012