skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 27/06/22 19:53:51 PM

Beaudoin, Emily Patricia Irene

CPSO#: 92989

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 04 Jun 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 06 Jun 2022

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education: University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bridlewood Medical Centre
64 Stonehaven Dr
Kanata ON  K2M 2Y2
Phone: (613) 592-0805 Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:21 Jun 2021 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine Effective:21 Jun 2021 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. EMILY PATRICIA IRENE BEAUDOIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEAUDOIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 23 Sep 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 24 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 22 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 23 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2014 to 14 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 15 Dec 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2015 to 20 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 21 Dec 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2018 to 18 Nov 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 19 Nov 2018 to 13 Jan 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jan 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Jun 2020
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 03 Jun 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jun 2022