skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 24/10/21 12:17:32 PM

Eltorki, Mohamed Mahmoud Fahmi

CPSO#: 92975

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 13 Apr 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 13 Apr 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Alexandria University Faculty of Medicin, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
HHSC McMaster Children's Hospital
Department of Pediatric
Emergency Medicine
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 76472
Fax: (905) 570-8992 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Mohamed Eltorki Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 18 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Eltorki ( CPSO# 92975 )

Business Address:
HHSC McMaster Children's Hospital
Department of Pediatric Emergency Medicine
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp Mc,Master & Childr Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Pediatric Emergency Medicine Effective:21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MOHAMED MAHMOUD FAHMI ELTORKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELTORKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
AVP - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 21 Oct 2014 to 17 Nov 2014
EL - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Nov 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Apr 2015