skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 25/07/21 23:54:08 PM

Abohweyere, Anierhe Erhiavwe Joan

CPSO#: 92921

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 17 Jul 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 16 Jul 2021

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ibadan, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Whitby Paediatric Associates
Dundas-Centre Medical
Suite 306
220 Dundas Street West
Whitby ON  L1N 8M7
Phone: (905) 665-9001
Fax: (905) 665-9335 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Anierhe E. Joan Abohweyere Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 14 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Abohweyere ( CPSO# 92921 )

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
Department of Paediatrics
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Business Address:
Dundas Medical Centre
Suite 306
220 Dundas Street West
Whitby ON  L1N 8M7
Phone Number: (905) 665-9001


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:17 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
PEAP - CF - Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
AVP - Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Jul 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2021

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 22 Jul 2021 Active
 
As from July 16, 2021, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Anierhe Erhiavwe Joan Abohweyere in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Abohweyere to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
("Undertaking") of
DR. ANIERHE ERHIAVWE JOAN ABOHWEYERE
("Dr. Abohweyere") to
COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the "College")

A.	PREAMBLE

(1)	In this Undertaking:

"Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the
Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended; "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the public.
(2)	I, Dr. Abohweyere, certificate of registration number 92921, am a member of the College.

(3)	I, Dr. Abohweyere, acknowledge that, following a public complaint, the College conducted an investigation bearing File Number 1116260 (the "Investigation") into the care I provided in my pediatric practice.

B.	UNDERTAKING

(4)	I, Dr. Abohweyere, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking, effective immediately.

(5)	Professional Education
(a)	I, Dr. Abohweyere, undertake to participate in and successfully complete all aspects of the detailed Individualized Education Plan, attached hereto as Appendix "A", including all of the following professional education (the "Professional Education"):

(i)	Review, reflection, and a written summary of the following:

1.	Abib, Simone de Campos Vieira et al. Renal tumor and trauma: a pitfall for conservative management. Int Braz J Urol [online]. 2011, v. 37, n.4, pp. 514-518. https://doi.org/10.1590/S1677-55382011000400011

2.	Chintagumpala M. Presentation, diagnosis, and staging of Wilms tumor. UpToDate. www.uptodate.com/contents/presentation-diagnosis-and- staging-of-wilms-tumor

3.	Croskerry P. The importance of cognitive errors in diagnosis and strategies to minimize them. Acad Med 2003;78(8):775-80. https://doi.org/10.1097/00001888-200308000-00003

4.	Etchells E. Anchoring bias with critical implications. AHRQ WebM&M 2015 June. https://psnet.ahrq.gov/web-mm/anchoring-bias-critical- implications

(b)	I, Dr. Abohweyere, undertake to complete this requirement by August 31, 2021. I acknowledge that the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have successfully completed the Professional Education.

(c)	I, Dr. Abohweyere, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided to the College regarding my progress and compliance with the Professional Education.

(d)	I, Dr. Abohweyere, acknowledge that if any of the resources listed above become unavailable, substitution requests will be reviewed by the College and the College will determine in its sole discretion whether substitution is appropriate.

C.	ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

(6)	I, Dr. Abohweyere, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

(7)	I, Dr. Abohweyere, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking.

(8)	I, Dr. Abohweyere, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.

(9)	I, Dr. Abohweyere, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs of Staff").

(10)	I, Dr. Abohweyere, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Committee of the College.

(11)	I, Dr. Abohweyere, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the purposes of section 23 of the Code.
 
(12)	Public Register

(a)	I, Dr. Abohweyere, acknowledge that, during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on the Public Register.

(b)	I, Dr. Abohweyere, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being posted in accordance with section 12(a) above, the following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:

A College investigation was conducted into the care Dr. Abohweyere provided in his pediatric practice. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Abohweyere will engage in professional education in the areas of renal tumor, anchoring bias and diagnostic errors.

(c)	I, Dr. Abohweyere, acknowledge that this Undertaking remains in effect until the College determines its terms are satisfied.

D.	CONSENT

(13)	I, Dr. Abohweyere, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the following information to any person who requires this information for the purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education:

(a)	any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking;

(b)	any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment of, my practice; and

(c)	any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

(14)	I, Dr. Abohweyere, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

(15)	I, Dr. Abohweyere, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who facilitate my completion of the Professional Education, and to all Chiefs of Staff, to disclose to the College, and to one another, any of the following:

(a)	any information relevant to this Undertaking;

(b)	any information relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this Undertaking;
 
(c)	any information which comes to their attention in the course of providing the Professional Education and which they reasonably believe indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.



Concerns

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: July 16, 2021
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Anierhe Erhiavwe Joan Abohweyere to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective July 16, 2021:

A College investigation was conducted into the care Dr. Abohweyere provided in his pediatric practice. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Abohweyere will engage in professional education in the areas of renal tumor, anchoring bias and diagnostic errors.