skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 01/08/21 0:09:24 AM

Ho, Ada Ka Yun

CPSO#: 92897

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Western University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
36 King Street
Brantford ON  N3T 3C5
Phone: (519) 752-4340
Fax: (519) 752-6096 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

12 Flemington Rd
Toronto ON  M6A 2N4
Canada
Phone: 4167871661
Fax: 4167873761
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Wong & Ho Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 02 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Wong ( CPSO# 89026 )
Dr. A. Ho ( CPSO# 92897 )

Business Address:
36 King Street
Brantford ON  N3T 3C5
Phone Number: (519) 752-4340

Business Address:
18 Centre Street
Thornhill ON  L4J 1E9
Phone Number: (905) 889-3634

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ADA KA YUN HO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2012