THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 2:39:27 AM
Klok, Jennifer Alicia
CPSO#:
92873
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
30 Jun 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of British Columbia Faculty o, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: J.A. Klok Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 15 2019
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients seeking a copy of their medical record may write to Dr. Reid Chambers at The Medical Arts Clinic, 301-272 Charlotte Street, Peterborough, ON, K9J 2V4; 705-876-9003 (phone), 705-874-5410 (fax)
Date Received: 10 Nov 2020
Instructions/Address:301-272 Charlotte St
Peterborough ON K9J 2V4
Date Received: 14 May 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Plastic Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Plastic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2015 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2019 |