THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 9:50:22 AM
Costantini, Daniela Frances
CPSO#:
92867
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
03 Jan 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 Jan 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Villani, Daniela Frances (used until: 15 May 2011 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Italian
Education: McMaster University, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
9600 Bathurst Street, 3rd floor,
suite 300
Vaughan ON L6A 3Z8
Phone: (289) 269-1522
Fax: (905) 303-9773
Electoral District: 05
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Costantini Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 23 2022
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DANIELA FRANCES COSTANTINI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COSTANTINI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 29 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 29 Sep 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Jan 2014 |