skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 21/10/21 0:24:51 AM

Roy, Melanie

CPSO#: 92859

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 19 Aug 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 19 Aug 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Méde, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lasik MD
1250 Boulevard Rene-Levesque Ouest
Montreal QC  H3B 5W8
Phone: (514) 845-1515

Additional Practice Location(s)

407 Laurier Av OUest
Minto Place Atrium
Ottawa ON  K1R 7Y7
Canada
Phone: 613-232-2665 Ext. 2801
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



New Brunswick
Nova Scotia
Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective:30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MELANIE ROY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 May 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 2016