skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 30/06/22 6:58:22 AM

Fonseca Sheridan, Adriana

CPSO#: 92858

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jun 2022
EXPIRY DATE
02 Jun 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Fonseca Gonzalez, Adriana del Pilar (used until: 06 May 2013 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education: Colegio Mayor De Ntra Sra Del Rosario, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - District of Columbia
USA - Virginia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Pediatric Hematology/Oncology Effective:27 Sep 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 23 Sep 2010
AVP - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Sep 2020
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Nov 2021
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2022