skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 01/07/22 9:59:08 AM

Sidhu, Amandeep

CPSO#: 92852

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 08 Aug 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 08 Aug 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education: University of Ottawa, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
585 University Ave
Toronto General Hospital
9-MaRS-9096
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone: 416-340-4800 Ext. 5112
Fax: 416-340-3801 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Amandeep Sidhu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 22 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Sidhu ( CPSO# 92852 )

Business Address:
UHN Toronto General Hospital
11PMB-133
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4800

Business Address:
Women's College Hospital
4th Floor Respirology Clinic
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone Number: (416) 323-6137

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective:09 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AMANDEEP SIDHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIDHU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 31 May 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
EL - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 11 Feb 2013 to 10 Mar 2013
EL - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 06 Jan 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 05 Jan 2015
CF - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 May 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Feb 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Mar 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2013