skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 05/08/21 7:07:11 AM

Sheehan, Kathleen Ann

CPSO#: 92836

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4800 Ext. 6762
Fax: 416-340-4198 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: K. A. Sheehan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 22 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Sheehan ( CPSO# 92836 )

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4800

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KATHLEEN ANN SHEEHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHEEHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015