THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 6:04:00 AM
Nuri, Humayun
CPSO#:
92823
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Feb 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Feb 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Saba University School of Medicine, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 602B
581 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON L3Y 2P6
Phone: 9059537917
Electoral District: 05
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Humayun Nuri Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 16 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:03 May 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:03 Oct 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. HUMAYUN NURI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NURI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 07 Jun 2010 to 20 Jun 2010
EL - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 04 Jun 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
EL - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 07 Jun 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 20 Jun 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jun 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Feb 2015 |