skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 31/07/21 5:21:05 AM

Katsios, Christina Maria

CPSO#: 92814

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Greek, Spanish

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Princess Margaret Cancer Centre, De
610 University Ave
5-700
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: 416-946-4501 x
Fax: 416-946-2877 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Christina Katsios Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 14 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Katsios ( CPSO# 92814 )

Business Address:
Princess Margaret Cancer Centre, Dept of Medicine
610 University Ave
5-700
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: 416-946-4501 x

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Muskoka Algonquin Health Care,South Muskoka Memorial Site Bracebridge
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:06 May 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CHRISTINA MARIA KATSIOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KATSIOS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Critical Care Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2015