THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 20:59:30 PM
Harris, Aaron
CPSO#:
92808
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
12 Oct 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 Oct 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 105
840 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON M4C 5T2
Phone: (416) 469-6464
Fax: (416) 469-6164
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Toronto East Health Network |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:28 Sep 2012 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. AARON HARRIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARRIS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Sep 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Sep 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Oct 2012 |