THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 18:30:22 PM
Fowler-Woods, Melinda Joye
CPSO#:
92803
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
22 Jul 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Jul 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Fowler, Melinda Joye (used until: 23 Jan 2022 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Room S206 Medical Services Building
750 Bannatyne Avenue
Winnipeg MB R3E0W2
Phone: (204) 789-3511
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Manitoba
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:11 Dec 2012 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MELINDA JOYE FOWLER-WOODS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FOWLER-WOODS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 29 Aug 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Jan 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jan 2013 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 11 Aug 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jul 2016 |