skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 01/08/21 6:33:25 AM

Khatri, Prateek

CPSO#: 92776

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Jun 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie St, Room GSE-140
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6000
Fax: (647) 874-8992 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 106
17730 Leslie St.
Newmarket ON  L3Y3E4
Canada
Phone: 905-836-2626
Fax: 905-836-5043
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Prateek Khatri Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 25 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Khatri ( CPSO# 92776 )

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
Division of General Internal Medicine
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6000

Business Address:
Sault Area Hospital
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Phone Number: (705) 759-3434

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PRATEEK KHATRI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHATRI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Aug 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Aug 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Feb 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014