skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 23/10/21 6:46:47 AM

Field, Courtney Blair

CPSO#: 92768

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Halton McMaster Family Health
Centre
1221 Lakeshore Road, Suite 103
Burlington ON  L7S 1A7
Phone: (905) 333-8222
Fax: 905-333-9343 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Courtney Field Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 12 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Field ( CPSO# 92768 )

Business Address:
Halton McMaster Family Health Centre
1221 Lakeshore Road
Suite 103
Burlington ON  L7S 1A7
Phone Number: (905) 333-8222

Business Address:
1230 Northshore Boulevard East
Halton Hills ON  L7S 1W7
Phone Number: (905) 632-3737

Business Address:
3350 Fairview Street
Halton Hills ON  L7N 3L5
Phone Number: (905) 825-6000

Business Address:
232 South Service Road
Suite B
Halton Hills ON  L6L 2X5
Phone Number: (905) 825-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. COURTNEY BLAIR FIELD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FIELD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2012