THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 18:04:23 PM
Bennett, Erin Anne
CPSO#:
92741
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
09 Aug 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Aug 2022
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
5230 Mitch Owens Road
Ottawa ON K4M 0V1
Phone: 6136922571
Electoral District: 07
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:27 Jun 2008 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ERIN ANNE BENNETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BENNETT is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 May 2010 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jul 2019 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 09 Aug 2022 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Aug 2022 |