skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 09/12/21 6:37:56 AM

DiValentino, Dennis Ryan

CPSO#: 92740

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 29 Oct 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The Flinders Univ of South Australia, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2A-35 Upper Centennial Pky
Stoney Creek ON  L8J 3W2
Phone: 905-662-8274
Fax: 905-662-3320 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

90 Wellington St N
Hamilton ON  L8R1N1
Canada
Phone: 905-570-1000
Fax: 905-570-1001
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

90 Wellington St N
Hamilton ON  L8R 1N1
Canada
Phone: 9055701000
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

112 Queenston St
St Catharines ON  L2R 2Z4
Canada
Phone: 9055701000
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: DiValentino Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 30 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. D. DiValentino ( CPSO# 92740 )

Business Address:
90 Wellington Street North
Hamilton ON  L8R 1N1
Phone Number: (905) 570-1000

Business Address:
35 Upper Centennial Parkway
Hamilton ON  L8J W2
Phone Number: 905-662-8274

Business Address:
112 Queenston St
St Catharines ON  L2R 2Z4

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DENNIS RYAN DIVALENTINO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DIVALENTINO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 23 Sep 2010
AVP - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2012
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Apr 2019
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 11 Apr 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Oct 2019