THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 6:57:32 AM
Whitten-Stovall, Richard Frank
CPSO#:
92734
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
11 Apr 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Jun 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Emory University, 1977
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - North Dakota
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jun 2010 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jun 2010 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 15 Jun 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Nov 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Jan 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Sep 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Apr 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 18 Apr 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 18 Apr 2013 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 11 Apr 2023 |