THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 20:10:43 PM
Alotaibi, Abdullah Saad M
CPSO#:
92729
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
30 Jun 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
01 Jul 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: King Faisal University, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Cardiac Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 17 May 2010 to 24 Jun 2010
PEAP - R - Cardiac Surgery
McMaster University, 25 Jun 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Cardiac Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Cardiac Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Cardiac Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Cardiac Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiac Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiac Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiac Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Cardiac Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 17 May 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jun 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2018 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2019 |