THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 1:32:00 AM
Roussos, Marios
CPSO#:
92724
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 May 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 May 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Greek
Education: Queen's University, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Thunder Bay Regional Health
Sciences Centre
Department of Critical Care
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON P7B 6V4
Phone: (807) 684-6366
Electoral District: 09
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Chessex & Roussos Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 8 2022
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Quebec
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre |
Thunder Bay |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Critical Care Medicine |
Effective:27 Sep 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARIOS ROUSSOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROUSSOS is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 May 2010 |