skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 20/10/21 8:56:34 AM

Jeschke, Marc Gerhard

CPSO#: 92713

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 20 Jan 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Academic Practice as of 20 Jan 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:Eberhard Karls University at Tubingen, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Ross Tilley Burn Centre
D Wing, 7th Floor, Room D704
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6703
Fax: (416) 480-6763 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Marc Jeschke Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 19 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Jeschke ( CPSO# 92713 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Research Institute
Department of Surgery & Plastic Surgery
Room D704
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6703


Corporation Name: Alan David Rogers Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 11 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Jeschke ( CPSO# 92713 )
Dr. A. Rogers ( CPSO# 104310)

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Ross Tilley Burn Centre
Suite D718
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Texas

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St John's Rehabilitation Hospital Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective:03 May 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MARC GERHARD JESCHKE may practise medicine only in a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO in which Dr. JESCHKE holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment at the rank of full or associate professor;

(2) Dr. JESCHKE may practise medicine only to the extent required by the teaching or research requirements of the appointment referred to in clause (1);

(3) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. JESCHKE no longer holds certification by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family Physicians of Canada,

(ii) When Dr. JESCHKE no longer holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment to the academic staff of an accredited medical school in Ontario at the rank of full or associate professor,

(iii) When Dr. JESCHKE no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

NOTE: The expiry date of this certificate is as explained above.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 May 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 05 May 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 03 May 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Jan 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jan 2012
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 17 Jun 2014