THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 9:35:36 AM
Payne, Eric Thomas
CPSO#:
92701
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
30 Jun 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
25 Aug 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: University of Calgary, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:30 Jun 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 03 May 2010 to 30 May 2010
EL - Paediatric Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Paediatric Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Paediatric Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Paediatric Neurology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 May 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 May 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 25 Aug 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2014 |