skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 24/07/21 7:11:11 AM

Suryanarayan, Deepa

CPSO#: 92674

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 10 Aug 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 20 Sep 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Kannada, Malayalam

Education:Mysore University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:26 Aug 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective:18 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 26 Apr 2010 to 09 May 2010
EL - Hematology

McMaster University, 10 May 2010 to 30 May 2010
EL - Hematology

McMaster University, 14 Jan 2013 to 03 Feb 2013
EL - Hematology

University Of Toronto, 04 Feb 2013 to 15 Feb 2013
EL - Hematology

McMaster University, 22 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Apr 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 May 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Feb 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2013
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 10 Aug 2017