THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 4:18:16 AM
Sant, Nadia Prema
CPSO#:
92630
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Jun 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital-General Campus
Division of Microbiology
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 72389
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Queensway Carleton Hospital |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Infectious Diseases |
Effective:26 Sep 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Medical Microbiology |
Effective:20 May 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NADIA PREMA SANT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SANT is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 05 Apr 2010 to 02 May 2010
EL - Infectious Diseases
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Infectious Diseases
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Medical Microbiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 7 - Medical Microbiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 05 Apr 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 02 May 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jun 2013 |