THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 8:59:41 AM
Sherif, Abdulaziz Abubeker
CPSO#:
92629
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
31 Jan 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
31 Jan 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Jimma University, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 05 Apr 2010 to 23 Jun 2010
PEAP - CF - Hematology
University of Toronto, 24 Jun 2010 to 30 Apr 2011
CF - Hematology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Hematology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 31 Dec 2018
CF - Hematology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2019 to 31 Jan 2019
CF - Hematology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 05 Apr 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jun 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Apr 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 31 Jan 2018 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jan 2019 |