skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 24/07/21 22:10:30 PM

Halka, Hany Helmy Ibrahem

CPSO#: 92613

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 13 Apr 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 13 Apr 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Asyut University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Eglinton Medical Center
Unit 46
480 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5R 0G2
Phone: (905) 501-0100
Fax: (905) 507-0003 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

F001B-6045 Creditview Rd.
Mississauga ON  L5V 2A8
Canada
Phone: (905) 826-6095
Fax: (905) 826-9219
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Hany Halka Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 24 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Halka ( CPSO# 92613 )

Business Address:
Eglinton Medical Centre
Unit 46
480 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5R 0G2
Phone Number: (905) 501-0100

Business Address:
6045 Creditview Road
F001B
Mississauga ON  L5V 2A8
Phone Number: (905) 826-6095

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:14 Dec 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. HANY HELMY IBRAHEM HALKA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HALKA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Mar 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Mar 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 25 Mar 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Apr 2012