THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 7:45:30 AM
Alsahli, Mazen
CPSO#:
92612
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
26 Mar 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
26 Mar 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Aleppo, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
531 Davis Drive
Suite 309
Newmarket ON L3Y 6P5
Phone: (905) 898-6100
Fax: (905) 898-6105
Electoral District: 05
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Connecticut
USA - Pennsylvania
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Southlake Regional Health Centre |
Newmarket |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:26 Mar 2010 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Endocrinology and Metabolism |
Effective:26 Mar 2010 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 26 Mar 2010 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 26 Mar 2010 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 25 Sep 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Sep 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Dec 2012 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 18 Dec 2012 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Dec 2012 |
|
Active |