THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 4:14:54 AM
Almehmadi, Fahad Saleh M
CPSO#:
92607
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
11 Jan 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Oct 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Umm Al-Qura University Faculty of Medici, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Almehmadi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 12 2022
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Saudi Arabia
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:22 Jul 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:16 Nov 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Apr 2010 to 28 May 2010
PEAP - R - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 22 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 23 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 22 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 23 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 22 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 23 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 20 Aug 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 21 Aug 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 20 Aug 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 03 Oct 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Cardiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Cardiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2018 to 31 Mar 2019
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Apr 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 May 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Oct 2014 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 11 Jan 2022 |