skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 25/07/21 19:19:05 PM

Muhame, Rugambwa Michael

CPSO#: 92581

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 19 Jul 2017
EXPIRY DATE
03 Sep 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Postgraduate Education (Clinical Fellow) as of 01 Sep 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Makerere Univ, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Paediatric Cardiology
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-1500 Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RUGAMBWA MICHAEL MUHAME may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. MUHAME is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. MUHAME shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. MUHAME is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. MUHAME shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. MUHAME ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,

(ii) When Dr. MUHAME ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or

(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.

Note: This certificate expires on 03 Sep 2021.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 16 Mar 2010 to 10 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Aug 2017
PEAP - CF - Pediatric Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Sep 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Pediatric Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Pediatric Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
CF - Pediatric Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
CF - Paediatric Critical Care

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2021 to 03 Sep 2021
CF - Pediatric Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Mar 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 03 Sep 2021