THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 16:28:47 PM
van den Heuvel, Mathilda
CPSO#:
92573
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Jul 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Dutch, English
Education: University of Amsterdam, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Ave
Toronto ON M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-2814 Ext. 222814
Fax: (416) 813-8345
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Netherlands
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hospital For Sick Children |
Toronto |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:01 Jul 2016 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2010 to 22 Apr 2010
PEAP - CF - Paediatric Gastroenterology
University of Toronto, 23 Apr 2010 to 20 Dec 2010
CF - Paediatric Gastroenterology
University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
CF - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 11 Mar 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Apr 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 20 Dec 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Apr 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2016 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2023 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2023 |
|
Active |