skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 20/10/21 9:04:38 AM

Valerio, Jason

CPSO#: 92571

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 06 Apr 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 12 Mar 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Ottawa, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective:30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 15 Mar 2010 to 11 Apr 2010
EL - Neurology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 12 Mar 2012 to 06 Apr 2012
EL - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Mar 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Apr 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Mar 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Apr 2012