skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 08/07/20 22:10:24 PM

Rosenberg, Jacob Judah

CPSO#: 92560

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 19 Jan 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 19 Jan 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Tel Aviv University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 310
8333 Weston Road
Woodbridge ON  L4L 8E2
Phone: (905) 850-3250
Fax: (905) 850-5607 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Jacob J. Rosenberg Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 09 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Rosenberg ( CPSO# 92560 )

Business Address:
Suite 310
8333 Weston Road
Woodbridge ON  L4L 8E2
Phone Number: (905) 850-3250

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:10 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JACOB JUDAH ROSENBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSENBERG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Mar 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 08 Mar 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 07 Mar 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Jan 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jan 2011