THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 1:54:13 AM
Hussain, Mohammed Farhan Iqbal
CPSO#:
92558
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
04 Mar 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
04 Mar 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu
Education: University of Karachi, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Etobicoke General Hospital
Mental Health
5th Floor
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON M9V 1R8
Phone: (416) 747-3400 Ext. 33591
Fax: (416) 747-3350
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Texas
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital |
Brampton |
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:04 Mar 2010 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 04 Mar 2010 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 04 Mar 2010 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 03 Sep 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Oct 2011 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 11 Oct 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Jun 2022 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Jun 2022 |
|
Active |