skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 06/08/21 0:41:06 AM

Chowdhury, Arupava

CPSO#: 92529

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2021
EXPIRY DATE
30 Jun 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Postgraduate Education as of 12 May 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Dhaka, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 25 Feb 2010 to 11 May 2010
PEAP - CF - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 12 May 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
CF - Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
CF - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 25 Feb 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 May 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2021