THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 9:46:18 AM
Husain, Juhi
CPSO#:
92518
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 Feb 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
23 Feb 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Urdu
Education: Aligarh Muslim University, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
William Osler Health Centre
Brampton Civic Hospital
Division of Oncology
2100 Bovaird Dr E
Brampton ON L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-6542
Fax: (905) 494-6416
Electoral District: 05
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
New Brunswick
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Medical Oncology |
Effective:23 Feb 2010 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Hematology |
Effective:02 Feb 2012 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:09 May 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 23 Feb 2010 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Feb 2010 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 22 Aug 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 06 Aug 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Dec 2011 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 02 Dec 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 02 Feb 2012 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 02 Feb 2012 |
|
Active |