THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 2:59:01 AM
De, Aloke
CPSO#:
92481
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
05 Feb 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Unknown
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of London, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Aloke De Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 11 2016
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients seeking to obtain a copy of their medical record may call Active Care Carlingwood at: 613-761-6777, or fax: 613-761-7744.
Date Received: 14 Sep 2017
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:06 Dec 2006 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Feb 2010 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2018 |