THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 6:18:28 AM
Almutawa, Mohammad
CPSO#:
92476
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Mar 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Mar 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: University of Aberdeen School of Medicin, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Health Science Centre
300 Prince Philip Dr
Department of Cardiology
St. John's NL A1B 3V6
Phone: 7097265311
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Alberta
Kuwait
Newfoundland and Labrador
United Kingdom
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:05 Nov 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MOHAMMAD ALMUTAWA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALMUTAWA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 08 Feb 2010 to 07 Mar 2010
EL - Clinical Immunology and Allergy
University of Toronto, 08 Mar 2010 to 04 Apr 2010
EL - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 08 Feb 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 04 Apr 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Mar 2017 |