THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 18:01:00 PM
Smith, Andrew James Kendric
CPSO#:
92373
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
22 Nov 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
22 Nov 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Spanish
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
C A M H
Addiction Medicine Service
100 Stokes Street
Toronto ON M6J 1H4
Phone: (416) 583-4685
Fax: (416) 595-6821
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pain Medicine |
Effective:07 Mar 2018 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Neurology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jan 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 23 Nov 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 23 Nov 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Nov 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Nov 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 22 Nov 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 22 Nov 2016 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 Mar 2018 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 Mar 2018 |
|
Active |