THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 6:05:08 AM
Provost, Viviane
CPSO#:
92312
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
06 Jun 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
14 Nov 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médeci, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:06 Dec 2006 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 10 Dec 2009 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 10 Dec 2009 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 09 Dec 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Dec 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 14 Nov 2011 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 06 Jun 2013 |