THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 10:43:28 AM
Lopes, Laudelino Marques
CPSO#:
92307
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jan 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
30 Jun 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Portuguese, Spanish
Education: Faculdade de Medicina de Valenca, 1977
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Laudelino Lopes Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 27 2023
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:23 Oct 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Dec 2009 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 19 Mar 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2016 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jan 2023 |