THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 8:39:42 AM
Boroujerdi, Mehrnaz
CPSO#:
92305
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
29 Jun 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Jun 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi
Education: Islamic Azad University, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
East Toronto Health Centre
1496 Danforth Avenue
Toronto ON M4J 1N4
Phone: (416) 778-1496
Fax: (416) 778-1400
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:12 May 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MEHRNAZ BOROUJERDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOROUJERDI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 14 Dec 2009 to 18 Dec 2009
EL - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2010 to 31 Aug 2011
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Dec 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 18 Dec 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 04 Nov 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 Nov 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 29 Oct 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 29 Jun 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jun 2015 |