skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 18/10/21 12:59:05 PM

Blunt, Danielle Nicole

CPSO#: 92295

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 13 Dec 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 11 Oct 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The Flinders Univ of South Australia, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Australia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 03 Dec 2009 to 16 Dec 2009
PEAP - R - Internal Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 17 Dec 2009 to 29 Jan 2010
EL - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2016 to 10 Oct 2016
PEAP - CF - Hematology

University of Toronto, 11 Oct 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Aug 2017
CF - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 31 Aug 2018
CF - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2018 to 13 Dec 2018
CF - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 Dec 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Dec 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Jan 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Oct 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Dec 2018