THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 1:57:16 AM
Mahfud, Abdulaati Salem
CPSO#:
92288
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Oct 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Oct 2021
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic
Education: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicin, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
700 Priestman St
Dr Everett Chalmers Regional Hospit
Emergency Department
Fredericton NB E3B 3B7
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
Lakeridge Health |
Oshawa |
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site |
Ajax |
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site |
Oshawa |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:21 Jun 2021 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ABDULAATI SALEM MAHFUD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAHFUD is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Dec 2009 to 27 Jan 2010
PEAP - CF - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 28 Jan 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Nov 2013
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Dec 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 27 Jan 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Feb 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Nov 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Oct 2021 |