THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 1:08:58 AM
Abbott, Lesleigh Selina
CPSO#:
92268
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Sep 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of
Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 2370
Fax: (613) 738-4828
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Pediatric Hematology/Oncology |
Effective:23 Sep 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LESLEIGH SELINA ABBOTT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABBOTT is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 23 Nov 2009 to 18 Dec 2009
EL - Paediatric Haematology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Nov 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 18 Dec 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Sep 2013 |