THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 20:10:26 PM
Cuthbert, David Anthony
CPSO#:
92267
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
08 Nov 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Nov 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Pennsylvania State University Coll of Me, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Walker Family Cancer Centre
1200 Fourth Ave.
St Catharines ON L2S 0A9
Phone: (905) 378-4647
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site |
St Catharines |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Radiation Oncology |
Effective:30 Jun 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DAVID ANTHONY CUTHBERT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CUTHBERT is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 16 Nov 2009 to 11 Dec 2009
EL - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Radiation Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Nov 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 11 Dec 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jul 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Nov 2017 |