skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 18/10/21 11:02:45 AM

Kycia, Katarzyna

CPSO#: 92252

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 22 Jun 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 15 Jan 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: PO Box 22133, Pollard Meadows, Edmonton, AB T6L 0A1
Date Received: 22 Jun 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:08 Jan 2010 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 16 Nov 2009 to 27 Dec 2009
EL - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Nov 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Dec 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Jun 2015